UT HB0197 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Earned Income Tax Credit and Related Funding
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit and Related Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 41 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-03-11 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ to House in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | House | Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-03-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-11 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB |
2013-03-08 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTREV |
2013-03-04 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTREV |
2013-02-12 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV |
2013-02-11 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-02-08 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-02-08 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-08 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-07 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |