UT HB0197 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Municipal and County Powers
Title
Amendments to Municipal and County Powers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-02 - House - House Comm - Tabled (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-04 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-03 | House Comm - Not Lifted from Table in HSTPOL | |
2011-01-26 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTPOL | |
2011-01-24 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-11 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-01-11 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2010-12-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |