UT HB0196 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Continuing Education Requirements for Landscape Architects

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing Education Requirements for Landscape Architects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 40 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-23 Governor Signed in LTGOV
2011-03-16 House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2011-02-21 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2011-02-17 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2011-02-17 Senate/ to House in HSPKR
2011-02-17 Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES
2011-02-16 Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2011-02-15 Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2011-02-14 Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS
2011-02-08 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-02-07 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2011-02-07 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2011-01-31 House/ committee report favorable in HSTBUS
2011-01-24 House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS
2011-01-11 House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HINTRO
2011-01-04 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC
2010-12-21 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2010-12-21 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback