UT HB0194 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Service Contracts Act Amendments
Title
Service Contracts Act Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTBUS | |
2011-01-28 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-27 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-01-26 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-01-25 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTWED | |
2011-01-24 | House/ to standing committee in HSTWED | |
2011-01-12 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HINTRO | |
2011-01-11 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2011-01-04 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2010-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2010-12-02 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |