UT HB0193 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public Highway Designation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Highway Designation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-10 House/ filed in HFILE
2011-03-10 Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK
2011-02-16 Senate/ circled in S2ND
2011-02-10 Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2011-02-09 Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTTPT
2011-02-02 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-01-31 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2011-01-31 House/ 3rd reading in HCON
2011-01-26 House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTTRA
2011-01-25 House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTTRA
2011-01-24 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2011-01-11 House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HINTRO
2011-01-11 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO
2010-12-21 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2010-12-21 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback