UT HB0192 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Private Property Rights
Title
Private Property Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2012-03-08 | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2012-03-05 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-04 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-03-02 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-29 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-21 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-09 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-09 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-08 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-07 | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-07 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-06 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-06 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-06 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-06 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |