UT HB0187 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Animal Shelter Amendments
Title
Animal Shelter Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House/ failed (Y: 31 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-02-23 | House/ failed in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-23 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-23 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-23 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-23 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-15 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-11 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-26 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |