UT HB0187 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agricultural Operation Interference
Title
Agricultural Operation Interference
Sponsors
Rep. John Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | House/ substituted in HSUB | |
2012-02-24 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-15 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-15 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-14 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-13 | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-13 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-13 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-13 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-09 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-09 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-08 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |