UT HB0187 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Peace Officer Standards and Training Amendments
Title
Peace Officer Standards and Training Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Wimmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-17 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-17 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-05 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-05 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-03 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-02 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |