UT HB0186 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lobbyist Amendments
Title
Lobbyist Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-25 | House | House/ held in House Docket Clerk |
2020-02-25 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-25 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-20 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-20 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | House Comm - Held in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-24 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |