UT HB0180 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales and Use Tax Exemption Amendments
Title
Sales and Use Tax Exemption Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-10 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-02-23 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-23 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-23 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-11 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-01 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-25 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-22 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |