UT HB0176 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revisor's Technical Corrections to Utah Code

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revisor's Technical Corrections to Utah Code

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2021-03-11 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2021-03-11HouseHouse/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
2021-03-10HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2021-03-10HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-02-17 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-17 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-12 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2021-02-12HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2021-02-12HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2021-02-12SenateSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President
2021-02-12SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-11SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-11SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-05SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-05SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-04SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-03SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-02SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-02SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-02SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-02SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-02-02HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-26HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-26HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-25HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-21HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-20HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-01-18 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-18 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-18 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
196119Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A2206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
26213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2660103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A35103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34A2407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34A3108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4911406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4913203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4920418Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4922205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53E1201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59101034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5912102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62A15103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63B1306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63G2204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I1226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I1251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I1253Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I1259Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2217Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2219Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2249Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2253Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63J3402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63M4503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63M7204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63N15501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
67222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
769802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
91209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96903Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback