UT HB0174 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal Instant Runoff Voting Amendments
Title
Municipal Instant Runoff Voting Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | House Comm - Held in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House Comm - Held in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-18 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-18 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Voting and Voter Registration
Government Operations (State Issues)
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Voting and Voter Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20A | 4 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 4 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 4 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 4 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 4 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 4 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |