UT HB0174 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Contracting for Medicaid Eligibility Determination Services
Title
Contracting for Medicaid Eligibility Determination Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB | |
2011-02-14 | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2011-02-09 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-08 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-04 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0174.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/hbillint/hb0174.pdf |