UT HB0168 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sale of Sexual Assault Test Kits Prohibited
Title
Sale of Sexual Assault Test Kits Prohibited
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-29 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-29 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-29 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-25 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-25 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-16 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-16 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |