UT HB0167 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Insanity Defense Amendments
Title
Insanity Defense Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Moss [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-03-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |