UT HB0163 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revisor's Statute

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revisor's Statute

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-28 Governor Signed in LTGOV
2011-03-16 House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2011-03-02 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2011-03-01 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2011-03-01 Senate/ to House in HSPKR
2011-03-01 Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES
2011-02-24 Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON
2011-02-24 Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTGOP
2011-02-22 Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP
2011-02-18 Senate/ received from House in SINTRO
2011-02-17 House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2011-02-10 House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDHB
2011-02-10 House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL
2011-02-09 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2011-02-07 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2011-02-04 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2011-02-04 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback