UT HB0160 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Distracted Driver Amendments
Title
Distracted Driver Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Moss [D] | Sen. Don Ipson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-23 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-18 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Crimes
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Pedestrian Safety
Roads/Highways
Traffic Violations
Transportation
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Pedestrian Safety
Roads/Highways
Traffic Violations
Transportation