UT HB0156S06 | 2013 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB0156S04

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Restoration of Terminated Parental Rights

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restoration of Terminated Parental Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-14 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-01 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2013-03-22 House/ to Governor in EGOV
2013-03-21HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2013-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK
2013-03-19 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2013-03-19 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-14 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-14HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2013-03-14HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSPKR
2013-03-14HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSPKR
2013-03-14HouseSenate/ to House in HSPKR
2013-03-14HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2013-03-14SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2013-03-14SenateHouse Conference Committee - Final Passage in SPRES
2013-03-14 House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in CONCOM
2013-03-14 House/ received from Senate in CONCOM
2013-03-14 Senate/ to House in CONCOM
2013-03-14 Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage in CONCOM
2013-03-14 Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in CONCOM
2013-03-14 Senate/ received from House in CONCOM
2013-03-14 Bill Substituted by Conference Committee in CONCOM
2013-03-14 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in CONCOM
2013-03-14 House/ to Senate in CONCOM
2013-03-14 House Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM
2013-03-14 House/ received from Senate in CONCOM
2013-03-14 Senate/ to House in CONCOM
2013-03-14 Senate Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments in SSEC
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ received from House in SSEC
2013-03-14SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2013-03-14SenateHouse/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment in SSEC
2013-03-14HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL
2013-03-14HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2013-03-14HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK
2013-03-14HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ floor amendment in S3RD
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2013-03-13SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2013-03-13SenateSenate/ floor amendment in S2ND
2013-03-13SenateSenate/ substituted in S2ND
2013-03-13SenateSenate/ uncircled in S2ND
2013-03-13SenateSenate/ circled in S2ND
2013-03-13SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2013-03-13SenateHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND
2013-03-12SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2013-03-08SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2013-03-08SenateSenate/ received from House in SINTRO
2013-03-07SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2013-03-07SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2013-03-07HouseHouse/ floor amendment in H3RDHB
2013-03-07HouseHouse/ uncircled in H3RDHB
2013-03-05HouseHouse/ circled in H3RDHB
2013-03-05HouseHouse/ floor amendment in H3RDHB
2013-03-05HouseHouse/ uncircled in H3RDHB
2013-03-05HouseHouse/ circled in H3RDHB
2013-03-05HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2013-03-01HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB
2013-03-01HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in HSTGOC
2013-03-01HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC
2013-02-27HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTGOC
2013-02-27HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTGOC
2013-02-22HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2013-02-22HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2013-02-22 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2013-02-22 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

HB0156S04 (Replaces) 2013-03-14 - Bill Substituted by Conference Committee in SSUB

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0156S06.htm
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/hbillint/hb0156s06.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/hbillenr/hb0156.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2013GS&voteid=2564&sequence=28195
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=671&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=706&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=707&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=708&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=806&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=808&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1573&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1602&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1603&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1604&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1605&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1700&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1701&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1215&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1781&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1823&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1263&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1264&house=H&sessionid=2013GS

Bill Comments

feedback