UT HB0155 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Smoke and Tobacco Free Capitol Hill
Title
Smoke and Tobacco Free Capitol Hill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - House/ failed (Y: 27 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-15 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-02-15 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-15 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-05 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-11 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-05 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-01-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |