UT HB0155 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0155S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Communication Agency Network and Utah 911 Committee Amendments
Title
Utah Communication Agency Network and Utah 911 Committee Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Dee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB |
2014-03-04 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTLAW |
2014-03-04 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTLAW |
2014-02-26 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTLAW |
2014-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTLAW |
2014-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTLAW |
2014-02-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW |
2014-02-21 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-21 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-02-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0155S01 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0155.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillint/hb0155.pdf |