UT HB0153 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Exemption Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exemption Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2018-03-08HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-03-07SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2018-02-27SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-27SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2018-02-26SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2018-02-26SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2018-02-22SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2018-02-21SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2018-02-21SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-02-20SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2018-02-20SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2018-02-20HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-07HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-07HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2018-02-06HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2018-02-06HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2018-02-02HouseHouse Comm - Held in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2018-01-23HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2018-01-17HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House
2018-01-11HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2018-01-04 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-01-04 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-01-04 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback