UT HB0152 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Contract Passenger Carrier Safety Act
Title
Contract Passenger Carrier Safety Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-02 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTTRA | |
2010-02-18 | House/ to standing committee in HSTTRA | |
2010-02-18 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-17 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-11 | House/ received from Senate in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-10 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0152.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0152.pdf |