UT HB0150S04 | 2014 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB0150S03

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01 Governor Signed in LTGOV
2014-03-21 House/ to Governor in EGOV
2014-03-21HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2014-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK
2014-03-18 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2014-03-16 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-13 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2014-03-13HouseSenate/ to House in HSPKR
2014-03-13HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2014-03-13SenateHouse Conference Committee - Final Passage in SPRES
2014-03-13 House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in CONCOM
2014-03-13 House/ received from Senate in CONCOM
2014-03-13 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in CONCOM
2014-03-13 Senate/ to House in CONCOM
2014-03-13 Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage in CONCOM
2014-03-13 Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in CONCOM
2014-03-13 Senate/ received from House in CONCOM
2014-03-13 Bill Substituted by Conference Committee in CONCOM
2014-03-13 House/ to Senate in CONCOM
2014-03-13 House Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM
2014-03-13 House/ received from Senate in CONCOM
2014-03-13 House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in CONCOM
2014-03-13 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in CONCOM
2014-03-13 Senate/ to House in CONCOM
2014-03-13 Senate Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments in SSEC
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ received from House in SSEC
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment in SSEC
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2014-03-13HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK
2014-03-13HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ uncircled in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ circled in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ substituted in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ uncircled in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ circled in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2014-03-07SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2014-03-07SenateSenate/ received from House in SINTRO
2014-03-06SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2014-03-06SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2014-03-06HouseHouse/ substituted in H3RDHB
2014-03-06HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2014-03-05HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB
2014-03-05HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL
2014-03-03HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in H3RDHB
2014-02-28HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB
2014-02-28HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSTEDU
2014-02-28HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDU
2014-02-28HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTEDU
2014-02-26HouseHouse Comm - Not Considered in HSTEDU
2014-02-24HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTEDU
2014-02-24HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL
2014-02-20HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2014-02-20HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2014-02-20 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC
2014-02-20 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

HB0150S03 (Replaces) 2014-03-13 - Bill Substituted by Conference Committee in SSUB

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0150S04.htm
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillint/hb0150s04.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillenr/hb0150.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2014GS&voteid=3532&sequence=27099
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=718&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=719&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1437&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1474&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1475&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1476&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1515&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1516&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1147&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1600&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1601&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1213&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1214&house=H&sessionid=2014GS

Bill Comments

feedback