UT HB0150 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transit Authority Amendments
Title
Transit Authority Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Transportation Committee |
2020-02-07 | House | House Comm - Held in House Transportation Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Transportation Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-19 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-16 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-16 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |