UT HB0149 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School Finance Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Finance Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-29 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2010-03-18 House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2010-03-16 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2010-03-11 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2010-03-11 Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2010-03-11 House/ to Senate in SPRES
2010-03-11 House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL
2010-03-11 Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK
2010-03-11 Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND
2010-03-10 Senate/ circled in S2ND
2010-03-10 Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2010-03-08 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2010-03-05 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2010-03-05 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2010-03-04 House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL
2010-03-02 House/ committee report favorable in HSTEDU
2010-02-24 House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU
2010-02-23 House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL
2010-02-23 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2010-02-19 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET
2010-02-19 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2010-02-05 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC
2010-02-05 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback