UT HB0148 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Alcohol Education Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol Education Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2021-02-18SenateSenate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table
2021-02-18SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-18SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-16SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-16SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-12SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-12SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-10SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-08SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-08SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-05SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-05SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-02-05HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-05HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-03HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-03HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-01HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-01HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Health and Human Services Committee
2021-01-29HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee
2021-01-29HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee
2021-01-25HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee
2021-01-20HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-13HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-01-12 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-12 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
26712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32B2308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63J1602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63M7303Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0148.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0148.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0148S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillamd/HB0148S01.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/hb0148s01.hfvp.01.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/hb0148s01.sca.02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0148.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0148.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0148S01_ComparedWith_HB0148.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0148S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0148S01.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18786
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18787
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=266&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19613
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19615
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=648&house=S

Bill Comments 750

feedback