UT HB0147 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Physician Certification Amendments
Title
Physician Certification Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-17 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Providers
Insurance, Health
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Occupations and Professions
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Providers
Insurance, Health
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Occupations and Professions
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/static/HB0147.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillint/HB0147.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/HB0147.fn.pdf |