UT HB0147 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Online Education Amendments
Title
Online Education Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2012-03-08 | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2012-02-29 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-27 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-27 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-24 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-23 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-22 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-21 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-20 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-15 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-15 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-14 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |