UT HB0146 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Became Law w/o Governor Signature in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Became Law w/o Governor Signature in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Licensing Amendments
Title
Local Licensing Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Became Law w/o Governor Signature in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-14 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-10 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-08 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-04 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2022-03-03 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ motion to reconsider in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-01 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 3 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-26 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-26 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 56 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 56 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 56 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 53 | 216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |