UT HB0141 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Early Voting Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Voting Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ floor amendment # 3 (Y: 37 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2018-03-16 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2018-03-15HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2018-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2018-03-06 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-06 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-05 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2018-03-05HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2018-03-05HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2018-03-05SenateSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President
2018-03-05SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate Consent Calendar
2018-03-02SenateSenate/ circled in Senate Consent Calendar
2018-03-02SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2018-02-27SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2018-02-27SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2018-02-27SenateSenate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2018-02-27SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2018-02-22SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2018-02-21SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2018-02-21SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-02-20SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2018-02-20SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2018-02-20HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-20HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-08HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-08HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in House Government Operations Committee
2018-02-07HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee
2018-02-07HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Government Operations Committee
2018-02-07HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Government Operations Committee
2018-01-26HouseHouse Comm - Not Considered in House Government Operations Committee
2018-01-25HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2018-01-17HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House
2018-01-17HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House
2018-01-11HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2018-01-02 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-01-02 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-01-02 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/static/HB0141.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillint/HB0141.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillamd/HB0141.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillenr/HB0141.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0141.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=6809
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=6812
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=6813
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=461&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=462&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=8204
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=8205
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=1163&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback