UT HB0141 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recreational Use of Public Water on Private Property
Title
Recreational Use of Public Water on Private Property
Sponsors
Rep. Kay McIff [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-16 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTNAE | |
2010-02-10 | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE | |
2010-02-09 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-09 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-09 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-09 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |