UT HB0139 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency and Disaster Management Amendments
Title
Emergency and Disaster Management Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Curtis Oda [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-18 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB | |
2010-02-18 | House Comm - Held in HSTGOC | |
2010-02-11 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-11 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-08 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-05 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |