UT HB0137 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation Changes
Title
Transportation Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-17 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2011-03-10 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-09 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-03-03 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-03 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-03 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-02 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-02 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-01 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-28 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTTRA | |
2011-02-25 | House/ to standing committee in HSTTRA | |
2011-02-25 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-25 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |