UT HB0136 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Became Law w/o Governor Signature in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Board of Education Revisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Education Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-08 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 4 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29 Became Law w/o Governor Signature in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2017-03-16 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2017-03-15HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2017-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2017-03-09 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-03-09 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-03-08 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-03-08HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2017-03-08HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2017-03-08HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2017-03-08SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2017-03-08SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2017-03-08SenateHouse/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President
2017-03-07HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2017-03-07HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2017-03-07HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2017-03-07HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2017-03-07SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-27SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-27SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-27SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-27SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 4 in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-08SenateSenate Comm - Held in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-07SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-03SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2017-02-03SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2017-02-02SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2017-02-02SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2017-02-02HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-02-02HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-01-27HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-01-27HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-01-26HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-01-26HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in House Education Committee
2017-01-25HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee
2017-01-25HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Education Committee
2017-01-25HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Education Committee
2017-01-24HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Education Committee
2017-01-23HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2017-01-23HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2017-01-19HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House
2017-01-18HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2017-01-16 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-01-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-01-16 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/static/HB0136.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/hbillint/HB0136.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/hbillamd/HB0136.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/hbillenr/HB0136.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2017/HB0136.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=935
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=943
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=940
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2017GS&voteid=89&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=3603
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=3616
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2017GS&voteid=1213&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2017GS&voteid=1055&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback