UT HB0134 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute Tax Credit for Home-schooling Parent
Title
Substitute Tax Credit for Home-schooling Parent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2015-03-12 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-11 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-13 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House Rules Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-01-21 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2015-01-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-01-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |