UT HB0130 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Election Day Voting Centers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Day Voting Centers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-10 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-25 Governor Signed in LTGOV
2011-03-18 House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2011-03-15 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2011-03-10 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2011-03-10 Senate/ to House in HSPKR
2011-03-10 Senate/ received from House in SPRES
2011-03-10 House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES
2011-03-10 House/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2011-03-10 Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2011-03-09 Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2011-03-09 Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2011-03-08 Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL
2011-03-02 Senate/ received from House in SINTRO
2011-02-28 House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2011-02-25 House/ 2nd reading in HCON
2011-02-25 House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTGOC
2011-02-22 House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC
2011-02-18 House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL
2011-02-18 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2011-02-16 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO
2011-02-15 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2011-02-05 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC
2011-02-04 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback