UT HB0126 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Offender Housing Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Offender Housing Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 3 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2018-03-16 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2018-03-16HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2018-03-16HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2018-03-14 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-14 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-08 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-08 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2018-03-08HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2018-03-08HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2018-03-08SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2018-03-08SenateHouse Conference Committee - Final Passage in Senate President
2018-03-08 House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee
2018-03-08 House/ received from Senate in Conference Committee
2018-03-08 Senate/ to House in Conference Committee
2018-03-08 Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage in Conference Committee
2018-03-08 Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee
2018-03-08 Senate/ received from House in Conference Committee
2018-03-08 Conference Committee Report in Conference Committee
2018-03-08 Bill amended by Conference Committee # 2 in Conference Committee
2018-03-08 House/ to Senate in Conference Committee
2018-03-08 House Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee
2018-03-08 House/ received from Senate in Conference Committee
2018-03-08 Senate/ to House in Conference Committee
2018-03-08 Senate Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments in Senate Secretary
2018-03-07SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2018-03-07SenateHouse/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment in Senate Secretary
2018-03-07HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2018-03-07HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2018-03-07HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2018-03-07HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2018-03-07SenateSenate/ substituted from # 3 to # 4 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2018-03-07SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-03-06SenateHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2018-03-05SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table
2018-02-28SenateSenate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table
2018-02-28SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2018-02-28SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2018-02-28SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-16SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-16SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-16SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-16SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 3 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-14SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-13SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-09SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2018-02-09SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-02-08SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2018-02-08SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2018-02-08HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-08HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-01-31HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-01-31HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-01-30HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-01-23HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2018-01-11HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2017-12-21 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-12-21 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/static/HB0126.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillint/HB0126.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillint/HB0126S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillint/HB0126S03.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillint/HB0126S04.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillamd/HB0126S04.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillenr/HB0126.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0126.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0126S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0126S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0126S03.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0126S04.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=6145
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=256&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=7551
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=7553
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=988&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=1413&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=1526&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=1257&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback