UT HB0121 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sexual Solicitation Amendments
Title
Sexual Solicitation Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Jen Seelig [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House/ substituted in HSUB | |
2011-02-16 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-15 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTJUD | |
2011-02-11 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTJUD | |
2011-02-10 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-07 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-07 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |