UT HB0118 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Retail Tobacco Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Tobacco Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 4 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-03-12HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2020-03-10SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in Senate Substituted Bill
2020-03-09SenateSenate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-03-09SenateSenate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-03-09SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 4 in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-03-09SenateHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-03-09SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-03-06SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-03-05SenateSenate Comm - Held in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-03-02SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-25SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-02-25SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-02-25SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-02-25SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2020-02-25HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-24HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-24HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-20HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-20HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-18HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-18HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-18HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-17HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-13HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-29HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2020-01-27HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-01-16HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-01-07 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-01-07 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/HB0118.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0118.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0118S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillamd/HB0118S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0118S04.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0118.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0118S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0118S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0118S04.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0118S03.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=15392
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=15393
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=15394
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=419&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16712
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=17117
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=17119

Bill Comments

feedback