UT HB0116 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Determination of Employer Status Amendments
Title
Determination of Employer Status Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House/ failed (Y: 33 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House/ failed (Y: 33 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2016-03-15 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2016-03-15 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-15 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-03-07 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-03-04 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2016-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2016-03-04 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2016-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2016-03-04 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2016-03-03 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2016-03-03 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-03 | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-03 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-02-09 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-08 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-08 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-04 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-04 | House | House/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-03 | House | House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-03 | House/ motion to reconsider in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-03 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House file for bills not passed |
2016-02-02 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-02-02 | House/ failed in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-02 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-02 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-01-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-01-28 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-25 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-13 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-05 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |