UT HB0113 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Consumer Sales Practices Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Sales Practices Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-28 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2020-03-23 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2020-03-23HouseHouse/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
2020-03-20HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-02-26 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-26 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-26 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-26 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-26 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-26HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2020-02-26HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2020-02-26HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2020-02-26SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2020-02-25SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2020-02-25SenateHouse Conference Committee - Final Passage in Senate President
2020-02-25 House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee
2020-02-25 House/ received from Senate in Conference Committee
2020-02-25 Senate/ to House in Conference Committee
2020-02-25 Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage in Conference Committee
2020-02-25 Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee
2020-02-25 Senate/ received from House in Conference Committee
2020-02-25 Conference Committee Report in Conference Committee
2020-02-25 Bill Substituted by Conference Committee from # 2 to # 3 in Conference Committee
2020-02-25 House/ to Senate in Conference Committee
2020-02-25 House Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee
2020-02-25 House/ received from Senate in Conference Committee
2020-02-24 Senate/ to House in Conference Committee
2020-02-24 Senate Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee
2020-02-24SenateSenate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments in Senate Secretary
2020-02-24SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2020-02-24SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-02-24SenateHouse/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment in Senate Secretary
2020-02-21HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2020-02-21HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-02-21HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2020-02-21HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2020-02-21SenateSenate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-02-21SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-02-20SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-02-20SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-02-19SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-02-19SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-18SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-12SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-11SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-10SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-02-10SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-02-10SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-02-10SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2020-02-10HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-10HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-04HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-04HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-03HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-03HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee
2020-01-29HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee
2020-01-28HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2020-01-28HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Business and Labor Committee
2020-01-27HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-01-16HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-01-06 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-01-06 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/HB0113.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0113.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0113S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillamd/HB0113S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0113S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0113S03.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillenr/HB0113.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0113S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0113.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0113S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0113S03.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=14563
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=14564
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=141&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=15338
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=400&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=457&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=586&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=455&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback