UT HB0113 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deferred Deposit Lending Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deferred Deposit Lending Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-10 House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
2011-03-03 House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL
2011-03-02 House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in HSTBUS
2011-02-09 House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS
2011-02-09 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2011-02-04 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2011-02-03 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2011-02-02 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback