UT HB0110 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County Jail Inmate Medical Costs
Title
County Jail Inmate Medical Costs
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Daw [R] | Sen. Jon Greiner [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-19 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-19 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2010-02-18 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2010-02-18 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTGOP | |
2010-02-11 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP | |
2010-02-10 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-02-09 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-02-04 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-04 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-01 | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW | |
2010-01-29 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-27 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |