UT HB0108S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0108
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mobile Home Park Task Force
Title
Mobile Home Park Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTNAE |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTNAE |
2014-03-04 | Senate | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTNAE |
2014-03-03 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTNAE |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE |
2014-03-03 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-27 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-27 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ substituted in H3RDHB |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-27 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in H3RDHB |
2014-02-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-19 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTBUS |
2014-02-19 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2014-02-13 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS |
2014-02-13 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-02-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0108 (Replaces) 2014-02-27 - House/ substituted in HSUB