UT HB0102 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Blasting Regulations
Title
Blasting Regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 1 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2012-03-08 | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2012-03-01 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-28 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-28 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-14 | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-10 | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-02 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-01 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-01-30 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-01-30 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-01-30 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |