UT HB0101 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0101S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowners Association Amendments
Title
Homeowners Association Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTBUS |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-02-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-02-12 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-02-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTBUS |
2013-02-06 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-02-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS |
2013-02-04 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-02-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-31 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-01-31 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-31 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0101S01 (Replaced by) 2013-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV