UT HB0100 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce Development Funding Amendments
Title
Workforce Development Funding Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-03-08 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-03-08 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-07 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-26 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-26 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-23 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-23 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2024-02-23 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-23 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-14 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-14 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-02-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-02 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Workforce Services
Government Operations (State Issues)
Public Funds and Accounts
Workforce Services
Government Operations (State Issues)
Public Funds and Accounts
Workforce Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31A | 38 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35A | 4 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35A | 4 | 314 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35A | 4 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35A | 4 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63B | 10 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |