UT HB0099 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0099S02
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reports to Legislature and Governor Amendments
Title
Reports to Legislature and Governor Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB |
2013-02-12 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTGOC |
2013-02-12 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC |
2013-02-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-02-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-02-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-31 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-01-31 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-31 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0099S02 (Replaced by) 2013-03-28 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0099.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/hbillint/hb0099.pdf |