UT HB0095 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Landscaping Requirements
Title
Landscaping Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Comm - Held in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business
Community/Condominium Associations (HOAs)
Counties
Local Government Ordinances
Municipalities
Natural Resources
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Real Property
Water
Community/Condominium Associations (HOAs)
Counties
Local Government Ordinances
Municipalities
Natural Resources
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Real Property
Water